WV HB4885 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Referred to Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Referred to Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to prohibit persons from sitting, standing, kneeling, or laying down in the roadway for the purpose of blocking traffic.
Title
Relating to blocking roadways
Sponsors
Del. Amy Summers [R] | Del. Phil Mallow [R] | Del. Chris Phillips [R] | Del. Heather Tully [R] |
Del. Chuck Horst [R] | Del. Roy Cooper [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 125) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2024-02-12 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2024-02-12 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Judiciary |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 125) |
2024-02-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-05 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2024-01-18 | House | To House Judiciary |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-18 | House | To Judiciary |
2024-01-18 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17C | 10 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |