WV HB4852 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 58, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 58, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the penalties for the manufacture, delivery, possession, or possession with intent to manufacture or deliver methamphetamine
Title
Relating to the penalties for the manufacture, delivery, possession, or possession with intent to manufacture or deliver methamphetamine
Sponsors
Del. John Shott [R] | Del. Moore Capito [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 707) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 516) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 365) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 516) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 365) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 58, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-19 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 707) |
2020-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 516) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2020-02-27 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-02-27 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 365) |
2020-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-25 | House | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2020-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2020-02-21 | House | From Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2020-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-19 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/20 |
2020-02-19 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-18 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-18 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-17 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-02-11 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-11 | House | To Judiciary |
2020-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60A | 4 | 401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |