WV HB4848 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 10, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 10, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to nonintoxicating beer
Title
Relating to nonintoxicating beer, wine and liquor licenses
Sponsors
Del. Brandon Steele [R] | Del. Mark Dean [R] | Del. Doug Smith [R] | Del. Kayla Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-12 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 550) (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 662) (Y: 58 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 467) (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 352) (Y: 64 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 662) (Y: 58 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 467) (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 352) (Y: 64 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 10, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/30/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-30 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/25/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/25/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/25/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 550) |
2022-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 662) |
2022-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Floor title amendment adopted |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Committee title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 467) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Floor amendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-11 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-10 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-03-09 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2022-03-03 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-03-03 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 352) |
2022-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-02 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-02 | House | Amendment to amendment adopted (Voice) |
2022-03-02 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2022-03-02 | House | Amendment withdrawn (Voice vote) |
2022-03-02 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2022-03-02 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Amendments pending |
2022-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-01 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-28 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-25 | House | Do pass |
2022-02-25 | House | Originating in House Government Organization |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 16 | 5a | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 16 | 6d | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 16 | 6f | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 16 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | 3A | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 3 | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 3A | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 3A | 3a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 3A | 3b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 3A | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 4 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 4 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 6 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 7 | 17 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
60 | 7 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 7 | 2a | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 7 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 7 | 8a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 7 | 8f | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 8 | 6c | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 8 | 6e | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 8 | 6f | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 8 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |