WV HB4637 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 36, Acts, 2008
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 36, Acts, 2008
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create the Broadband Deployment Council and to develop a strategy and mechanism to be employed in extending broadband to every West Virginian by stimulating demand for broadband services and by constructing the necessary infrastructure to meet that demand.
Title
Relating to the deployment of broadband to the remaining unserved areas of the state
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-08 | Chapter 36, Acts, 2008 | |
2008-03-31 | Approved by Governor 3/31/08 | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/31/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/31/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-26 | To Governor 3/26/08 | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/26/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/26/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-08 | House Message received | |
2008-03-08 | Completed legislative action | |
2008-03-08 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-03-08 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 496) | |
2008-03-08 | House received Senate message | |
2008-03-07 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2008-03-07 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 51) | |
2008-03-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-03-07 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 50) | |
2008-03-07 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-03-07 | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) | |
2008-03-07 | Amendments to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2008-03-07 | Floor amendment reported | |
2008-03-07 | Committee Amendment Reported | |
2008-03-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-03-07 | On 2nd reading | |
2008-03-07 | Rearranged on Calendar by Rules Committee | |
2008-03-06 | Read 1st time | |
2008-03-06 | On 1st reading | |
2008-03-06 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-03-06 | 2nd reference dispensed | |
2008-03-06 | Unanimous consent | |
2008-03-06 | Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Finance | |
2008-02-27 | To Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2008-02-27 | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Finance | |
2008-02-27 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-02-26 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-26 | Passed House (Roll No. 212) | |
2008-02-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-26 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-25 | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-02-24 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-24 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-02-24 | By substitute, do pass | |
2008-02-18 | To House Finance | |
2008-02-18 | Introduced in House | |
2008-02-18 | To Finance | |
2008-02-18 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB701 (Same As) 2008-02-18 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4637&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |