WV HB4557 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-06 - Vetoed by Governor 4/6/10
Status: Vetoed on March 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-06 - Vetoed by Governor 4/6/10
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require the Legislative Oversight Commission on Health and Human Resource Accountability to review all of the Department of Health and Human Resources' RFPs and change orders on existing contracts valued at over $500,000.
Title
Reviewing all of the Department of Health and Human Resources requests for proposals or change orders valued at over $500,000 prior to their release
Sponsors
Del. Barbara Hatfield [D] | Del. Virginia Mahan [D] | Del. Clif Moore [D] | Del. Nancy Peoples Guthrie [D] |
Del. Don Perdue [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-06 | Vetoed by Governor 4/6/10 | |
2010-03-20 | Vetoed by Governor 4/6/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-20 | Vetoed by Governor 4/6/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/22/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/22/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-22 | To Governor 3/22/10 | |
2010-03-13 | House received Senate message | |
2010-03-12 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-12 | Communicated to House | |
2010-03-12 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 15) | |
2010-03-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-12 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-03-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-11 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-03-10 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-10 | On 1st reading | |
2010-03-09 | 2nd reference dispensed | |
2010-03-09 | Unanimous consent | |
2010-03-09 | Reported do pass, but first to Finance | |
2010-03-01 | To Health and Human Resources | |
2010-03-01 | To Health and Human Resources then Finance | |
2010-03-01 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-02-26 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-02-26 | Passed House (Roll No. 110) | |
2010-02-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-02-26 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-02-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-02-25 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-02-24 | Read 1st time | |
2010-02-24 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-02-23 | By substitute, do pass | |
2010-02-18 | To House Health and Human Resources | |
2010-02-18 | Introduced in House | |
2010-02-18 | To Health and Human Resources | |
2010-02-18 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 29E | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4557&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |