WV HB4515 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 237, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 237, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to wildlife resources, eligibility for license or permit application
Title
Relating to wildlife resources, eligibility for license or permit application
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 203) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 121) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 121) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 237, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | House | Approved by Governor 3/5/20 |
2020-03-06 | House | Approved by Governor 3/5/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/5/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-02-28 | House | To Governor 2/27/20 - House Journal |
2020-02-27 | House | To Governor 2/27/20 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | To Governor 2/27/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-02-21 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 203) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-02-10 | Senate | To Natural Resources |
2020-02-10 | Senate | To Natural Resources |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 121) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-04 | House | Do pass |
2020-01-23 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-23 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2020-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB468 (Similar To) 2020-01-28 - To House Agriculture and Natural Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |