WV SB468 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - To House Agriculture and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - To House Agriculture and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to eligibility for license or permit application
Title
Relating to eligibility for license or permit application
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 30) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2020-01-28 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2020-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 30) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-01-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-01-24 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-01-23 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-01-15 | Senate | To Natural Resources |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-15 | Senate | To Natural Resources |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4515 (Similar To) 2020-04-15 - Chapter 237, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |