WV HB4497 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 119, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring an external defibrillator device at any secondary school athlete event

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring an external defibrillator device at any secondary school athlete event

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 749) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 553) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 344) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-15HouseChapter 119, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
2020-03-25HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20
2020-03-07HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-19HouseTo Governor 3/19/20
2020-03-07HouseTo Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateTo Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-07SenateHouse Message received
2020-03-07HouseCompleted legislative action
2020-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-07HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 749)
2020-03-07HouseHouse received Senate message
2020-03-07SenateSenate requests House to concur
2020-03-07SenateRucker Title amendment adopted
2020-03-07SenateEducation Title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
2020-03-07SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 553)
2020-03-07SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-07SenateAmended on 3rd reading (Voice vote)
2020-03-07SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-03-06SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-06SenateReturned to calendar by Rules Committee
2020-03-04SenateRemoved from calendar by Rules Committee
2020-03-04SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-03-03SenateRead 1st time
2020-03-03SenateImmediate consideration
2020-03-03SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2020-02-27SenateTo Education
2020-02-27SenateTo Education
2020-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-02-26HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-02-26HousePassed House (Roll No. 344)
2020-02-26HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-26HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-25HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-25HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-24HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-24HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-21HouseBy substitute, do pass
2020-02-19HouseTo House Finance
2020-02-19HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Finance
2020-01-23HouseTo House Education
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-23HouseTo Education then Finance
2020-01-23HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18225cNew CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback