WV HB4465 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 193, Acts, 2008
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 193, Acts, 2008
Summary
Relating to fees charged by the Secretary of State
Title
Relating to fees charged by the Secretary of State
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-08 | Chapter 193, Acts, 2008 | |
2008-03-31 | Approved by Governor 3/31/08 | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/31/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/31/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-25 | To Governor 3/25/08 | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/25/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/25/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-08 | House Message received | |
2008-03-08 | Completed legislative action | |
2008-03-08 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-03-08 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 474) | |
2008-03-08 | House received Senate message | |
2008-03-07 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2008-03-07 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 37) | |
2008-03-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-03-07 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 36) | |
2008-03-07 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-03-07 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2008-03-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-03-07 | On 2nd reading | |
2008-03-07 | Rearranged on Calendar by Rules Committee | |
2008-03-06 | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment | |
2008-03-06 | Having been read 1st time, prior proceedings, 3/3/08 | |
2008-03-03 | On second reading to Finance | |
2008-03-03 | Read 1st time | |
2008-03-03 | On 1st reading | |
2008-03-03 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-03-03 | Unanimous consent | |
2008-03-03 | Reported do pass, but first to Finance | |
2008-02-18 | To Judiciary | |
2008-02-18 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2008-02-18 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-02-15 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-15 | Passed House (Roll No. 66) | |
2008-02-15 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-15 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-14 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-14 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-13 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-13 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-02-12 | Do pass | |
2008-02-08 | To House Judiciary | |
2008-02-08 | Introduced in House | |
2008-02-08 | To Judiciary | |
2008-02-08 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4465&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |