WV HB4455 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to prohibit activities connected with bestiality; establish criminal penalties; provide for forfeiture of animals, payment of associated costs, and restrictions on owning animals upon conviction; and require psychiatric evaluation and counseling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to animal abuse

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 254) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01SenateTo Judiciary
2018-03-01SenateTo Judiciary
2018-03-01SenateIntroduced in Senate
2018-03-01SenateHouse Message received
2018-02-28HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-02-28HousePassed House (Roll No. 254)
2018-02-28HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-28HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-27HouseAmendment ruled not germane
2018-02-27HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-27HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-26HouseRead 1st time
2018-02-26HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-23HouseBy substitute, do pass
2018-02-07HouseTo House Judiciary
2018-02-07HouseIntroduced in House
2018-02-07HouseTo Judiciary
2018-02-07HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
61819dNew CodeSee Bill Text
61832New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback