WV HB4434 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 89, Acts, 2008
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 89, Acts, 2008
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to establish a higher education energy and water savings revolving loan fund.
Title
Establishing a higher education energy and water savings revolving loan fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-08 | Chapter 89, Acts, 2008 | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/28/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-28 | Approved by Governor 3/28/08 | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/28/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/25/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-25 | To Governor 3/25/08 | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/25/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-08 | House Message received | |
2008-03-08 | Completed legislative action | |
2008-03-08 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-03-08 | Effective July 1, 2008 (Roll No. 509) | |
2008-03-08 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 508) | |
2008-03-08 | House received Senate message | |
2008-03-08 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2008-03-08 | Effective July 1, 2008 (Roll No. 34) | |
2008-03-08 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 34) | |
2008-03-08 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-03-08 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-03-07 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2008-03-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-03-07 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-03-07 | Returned to 2nd reading | |
2008-03-07 | Unanimous consent | |
2008-03-07 | Reported do pass | |
2008-03-07 | Having been read 1st time, prior proceedings, 2/29/08 | |
2008-02-29 | On second reading to Finance | |
2008-02-29 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-29 | On 1st reading | |
2008-02-29 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-02-29 | Unanimous consent | |
2008-02-29 | Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Finance | |
2008-02-26 | To Education | |
2008-02-26 | To Education then Finance | |
2008-02-26 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-02-25 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-25 | Effective July 1, 2008 (Roll No. 128) | |
2008-02-25 | Passed House (Roll No. 127) | |
2008-02-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-25 | Amended on 3rd reading | |
2008-02-25 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-24 | Laid over on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/25/08 | |
2008-02-22 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-22 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-21 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-21 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-02-20 | By substitute, do pass | |
2008-02-05 | To House Finance | |
2008-02-05 | Do pass, but first to Finance | |
2008-02-05 | Originating in House Education |
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4434&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |