WV HB4416 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-27 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-27 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to add certified professional estimator services to the list of services exempt from consumers sales tax.
Title
Exempting certified professional estimator services from consumers sales tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - House - Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 212) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 211) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 211) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | Senate | To Finance |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-02-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-02-26 | House | Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 212) |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 211) |
2014-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-21 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2014-02-05 | House | To House Finance |
2014-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-05 | House | To Finance |
2014-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 15 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |