WV HB4402 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 109, Acts, 2008
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 109, Acts, 2008
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the Department of Health and Human Resources to bid and award contracts for gambling treatment programs; develop procedures and contract requirements, provide for performance monitoring; prohibit interference with the operation of the program; prohibit the use of Lottery Commission logo on advertising media; and require an annual report.
Title
Relating to compulsive gambling
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-08 | Chapter 109, Acts, 2008 | |
2008-03-28 | Approved by Governor 3/28/08 | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/28/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/28/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/25/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-25 | To Governor 3/25/08 | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/25/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-08 | Completed legislative action | |
2008-03-08 | Communicated to House | |
2008-03-08 | Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 95) | |
2008-03-08 | House Message received | |
2008-03-08 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-03-08 | House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 521) | |
2008-03-08 | Conference report received-House | |
2008-03-08 | Conference report filed - House | |
2008-03-08 | Conference report filed - Senate | |
2008-03-08 | House Message received | |
2008-03-08 | To conference | |
2008-03-08 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-03-08 | House appointed conferees: Palumbo, Miley, Hamilton | |
2008-03-08 | House agreed to conference | |
2008-03-08 | House received Senate message | |
2008-03-08 | Communicated to House | |
2008-03-08 | Senate appoints conference committee: Kessler, Oliverio, McKenzie | |
2008-03-08 | Senate refused to recede; requested conference (Voice vote) | |
2008-03-08 | House Message received | |
2008-03-08 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-03-08 | House refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice) | |
2008-03-08 | House received Senate message | |
2008-03-07 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2008-03-07 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 31) | |
2008-03-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-03-07 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 30) | |
2008-03-07 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-03-07 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2008-03-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-03-07 | On 2nd reading | |
2008-03-07 | Rearranged on Calendar by Rules Committee | |
2008-03-06 | Reported do pass | |
2008-03-06 | Having been read 1st time, prior proceedings, 3/5/08 | |
2008-03-05 | On second reading to Finance | |
2008-03-05 | Read 1st time | |
2008-03-05 | On 1st reading | |
2008-03-05 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-03-05 | Unanimous consent | |
2008-03-05 | Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Finance | |
2008-02-26 | To Judiciary | |
2008-02-26 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2008-02-26 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-02-25 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-25 | Passed House (Roll No. 149) | |
2008-02-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-25 | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 148) | |
2008-02-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-25 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-24 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-24 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-02-22 | By substitute, do pass | |
2008-02-14 | To House Judiciary | |
2008-02-14 | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2008-02-04 | To House Government Organization | |
2008-02-04 | Introduced in House | |
2008-02-04 | To Government Organization then Judiciary | |
2008-02-04 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4402&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |