WV HB4395 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on March 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Vetoed by Governor 3/25/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Removing the requirement that a veterinarian access and report to the controlled substance monitoring database

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removing the requirement that a veterinarian access and report to the controlled substance monitoring database

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 704) (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 499) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 100) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25HouseVetoed by Governor 3/25/20
2020-03-07HouseVetoed by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateVetoed by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-19HouseTo Governor 3/19/20
2020-03-07HouseTo Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateTo Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-07SenateHouse Message received
2020-03-07HouseCompleted legislative action
2020-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-07HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 704)
2020-03-07HouseHouse received Senate message
2020-03-06SenateSenate requests House to concur
2020-03-06SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 499)
2020-03-06SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-06SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-03-05SenateCommittee amendments adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-05SenateReturned to calendar by Rules Committee
2020-03-04SenateRemoved from calendar by Rules Committee
2020-03-04SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-03-03SenateRead 1st time
2020-03-03SenateImmediate consideration
2020-03-03SenateReported do pass, with amendments and title amendment
2020-02-06SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2020-02-06SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2020-02-06SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-02-05HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-02-05HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-02-05HousePassed House (Roll No. 100)
2020-02-05HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-05HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-04HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-04HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-03HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-03HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-01-31HouseBy substitute, do pass
2020-01-17HouseTo House Health and Human Resources
2020-01-17HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-17HouseTo Health and Human Resources
2020-01-17HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
60A1101Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback