WV HB4389 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 152, Acts, 2008
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 152, Acts, 2008
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to remove the requirement that resident violators of traffic laws be required to sign citations.
Title
Removing requirement that resident violators of traffic laws be required to sign citations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-08 | Chapter 152, Acts, 2008 | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/27/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-27 | Approved by Governor 3/27/08 | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/27/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/18/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/18/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-18 | To Governor 3/18/08 | |
2008-03-07 | House received Senate message | |
2008-03-07 | Completed legislative action | |
2008-03-07 | Communicated to House | |
2008-03-07 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 9) | |
2008-03-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-03-07 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-03-06 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-03-06 | On 2nd reading | |
2008-03-05 | Read 1st time | |
2008-03-05 | On 1st reading | |
2008-03-04 | Reported do pass | |
2008-03-03 | To Judiciary | |
2008-03-03 | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2008-02-18 | To Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2008-02-18 | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Judiciary | |
2008-02-18 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-02-15 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-15 | Passed House (Roll No. 64) | |
2008-02-15 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-15 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-14 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-14 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-13 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-13 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-02-12 | By substitute, do pass | |
2008-02-07 | To House Judiciary | |
2008-02-07 | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2008-02-04 | To House Roads and Transportation | |
2008-02-04 | Introduced in House | |
2008-02-04 | To Roads and Transportation then Judiciary | |
2008-02-04 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17C | 19 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |