WV HB4377 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Approved by Governor 3/25/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The Protection of Vulnerable Adults from Financial Exploitation Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Protection of Vulnerable Adults from Financial Exploitation Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 627) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 714) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 497) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 311) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20
2020-03-07HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-19HouseTo Governor 3/19/20
2020-03-07HouseTo Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateTo Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-07SenateCompleted legislative action
2020-03-07SenateCommunicated to House
2020-03-07SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 627)
2020-03-07SenateHouse Message received
2020-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-07HouseHouse concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 714)
2020-03-07HouseHouse received Senate message
2020-03-06SenateSenate requests House to concur
2020-03-06SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 497)
2020-03-06SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-06SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-03-05SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-05SenateReturned to calendar by Rules Committee
2020-03-04SenateRemoved from calendar by Rules Committee
2020-03-04SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-03-03SenateRead 1st time
2020-03-03SenateImmediate consideration
2020-03-03SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2020-02-26SenateTo Judiciary
2020-02-26SenateTo Judiciary
2020-02-26SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-02-25HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-02-25HousePassed House (Roll No. 311)
2020-02-25HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-25HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-24HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-24HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-21HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-21HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-20HouseBy substitute, do pass
2020-01-30HouseTo House Judiciary
2020-01-30HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
2020-01-16HouseTo House Senior, Children, and Family Issues
2020-01-16HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-16HouseTo Senior, Children, and Family Issues then Judiciary
2020-01-16HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
326601New CodeSee Bill Text
326602New CodeSee Bill Text
326603New CodeSee Bill Text
326604New CodeSee Bill Text
326605New CodeSee Bill Text
326606New CodeSee Bill Text
326607New CodeSee Bill Text
326608New CodeSee Bill Text
326609New CodeSee Bill Text
326610New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback