WV HB4361 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require the Veterans' Council to annually honor each West Virginian graduating from the U. S. Military Academy, the U. S. Naval Academy, the U. S. Air Force Academy and the U. S. Coast Guard Academy with the highest grade point average by bestowing upon him or her the West Augusta Award.
Title
Bestowing the West Augusta Award upon each West Virginian graduating from U. S. Military Academies with the highest grade point average
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 119) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | Senate | To Education |
2018-02-16 | Senate | To Education |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-16 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-15 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 119) |
2018-02-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-15 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-14 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-13 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-13 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-12 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2018-02-12 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-01-30 | House | To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security |
2018-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-30 | House | To Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security then Education |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9A | 1 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |