WV HB4323 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 212, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 212, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require well operators and pipeline operators to report certain emergency incidents to the Division of Homeland Security and Emergency Management within fifteen minutes, unless exceptions apply.
Title
Relating to the reporting of emergency incidents by well operators and pipeline operators
Sponsors
Del. Daryl Cowles [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-12 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 571) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 427) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 89) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 427) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 89) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Chapter 212, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/2016 - House Journal |
2016-03-30 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/30/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/24/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-24 | House | To Governor 3/24/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/24/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-12 | House | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 571) |
2016-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 427) |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-11 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-10 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments and title amendment |
2016-02-18 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-02-18 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-18 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-02-17 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-02-17 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 89) |
2016-02-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-17 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-16 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-02-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-16 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-15 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-15 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2016-02-12 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2016-02-03 | House | To House Energy |
2016-02-03 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Energy |
2016-01-28 | House | To House Industry and Labor |
2016-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-01-28 | House | To Industry and Labor then Energy |
2016-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB445 (Similar To) 2016-02-01 - To Energy, Industry and Mining
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 5C | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 5C | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |