WV HB4308 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-26 - To Health and Human Resources
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-26 - To Health and Human Resources
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to exempt from the nursing licensing provisions the care of the sick when done in connection with the practice of religious tenets of any church or religious organization and by or for its members.
Title
Exempting from the nursing licensing provisions the care of the sick when done in connection with the practice of religious tenets of any church or religious organization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-26 | To Health and Human Resources | |
2008-02-26 | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary | |
2008-02-26 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-02-25 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-25 | Passed House (Roll No. 115) | |
2008-02-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-25 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-24 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-22 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-22 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-02-21 | Do pass | |
2008-02-05 | To House Government Organization | |
2008-02-05 | Do pass, but first to Government Organization | |
2008-01-29 | To House Health and Human Resources | |
2008-01-29 | Introduced in House | |
2008-01-29 | To Health and Human Resources then Government Organization | |
2008-01-29 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4308&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |