WV HB4271 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-12 - Communicated to House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-12 - Communicated to House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
 The purpose of this bill is to end discretionary transfers to the Licensed Racetrack Modernization Fund. If this bill were enacted, these transfers of up to $9 million annually, which were to be permitted through July 1, 2020, would no longer be permitted; the Licensed Racetrack Modernization Fund would be closed; and that fund’s balance would be transferred to the General Revenue Fund of the state. The bill would also close the Historic Resort Hotel Modernization Fund and would transfer that fund’s balance to the General Revenue Fund as well.
Title
Ending discretionary transfers to the Licensed Racetrack Modernization Fund
Sponsors
Del. Tim Armstead [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-12 - Senate - Rejected by Senate (Roll No. 500) (Y: 6 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-01 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 287) (Y: 75 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 286) (Y: 62 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 287) (Y: 75 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 286) (Y: 62 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-12 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Rejected by Senate (Roll No. 500) |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Deferred until foot of 3rd reading |
2016-03-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2016-03-02 | Senate | To Finance |
2016-03-02 | Senate | To Finance |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-03-02 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-01 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 287) |
2016-03-01 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 286) |
2016-03-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-01 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2016-02-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-29 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-27 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-27 | House | Immediate consideration |
2016-02-27 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2016-01-26 | House | To House Finance |
2016-01-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-01-26 | House | To Finance |
2016-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB428 (Similar To) 2016-01-29 - To Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 22A | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22A | 10d | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 25 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 25 | 22b | Amended Code | Citation Text |