WV HB4159 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Vetoed on March 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Vetoed by Governor 3/25/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the manufacture and sale of hard cider

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the manufacture and sale of hard cider

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 636) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 763) (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 548) (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 337) (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25HouseVetoed by Governor 3/25/20
2020-03-07HouseVetoed by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateVetoed by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-19HouseTo Governor 3/19/20
2020-03-07HouseTo Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateTo Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-07SenateCompleted legislative action
2020-03-07SenateCommunicated to House
2020-03-07SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 636)
2020-03-07SenateHouse Message received
2020-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-07HouseHouse concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 763)
2020-03-07HouseHouse received Senate message
2020-03-07SenateSenate requests House to concur
2020-03-07SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 548)
2020-03-07SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-07SenateAmended on 3rd reading (Voice vote)
2020-03-06SenateLaid over on 3rd reading 3/6/20
2020-03-06SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-05SenateReturned to calendar by Rules Committee
2020-03-04SenateRemoved from calendar by Rules Committee
2020-03-04SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-03-03SenateRead 1st time
2020-03-03SenateImmediate consideration
2020-03-03SenateReported do pass
2020-02-27SenateTo Judiciary
2020-02-27SenateTo Judiciary
2020-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-02-26HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-02-26HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-02-26HousePassed House (Roll No. 337)
2020-02-26HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-26HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-25HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-02-25HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-25HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-24HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-24HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-21HouseDo pass
2020-02-06HouseTo House Judiciary
2020-02-06HouseDo pass, but first to Judiciary
2020-01-14HouseTo House Government Organization
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-14HouseTo Government Organization then Judiciary
2020-01-14HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19212New CodeSee Bill Text
19213New CodeSee Bill Text
6015aAmended CodeCitation Text
6082Amended CodeCitation Text
6083Amended CodeCitation Text
6084Amended CodeCitation Text
608A1New CodeSee Bill Text
608A2New CodeSee Bill Text
608A3New CodeSee Bill Text
608A4New CodeSee Bill Text
608A5New CodeSee Bill Text
608A6New CodeSee Bill Text
608A7New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback