WV HB4139 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 66, Acts, 2008
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 66, Acts, 2008
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide for the issuance of drivers' licenses to persons using bioptic telescopic lenses. The bill sets conditions, restrictions and limitations for licensing. The bill further authorizes the Division of Rehabilitation Services to promulgate the criteria for applicant enrollment in low vision driving courses, and the criteria for establishing low vision driving courses. The bill also makes technical and stylistic changes to the section.
Title
Relating to licensing persons using bioptic telescopic devices to operate a motor vehicle
Sponsors
Del. Lidella Hrutkay [D] | Del. Melvin Kessler [D] | Del. Clif Moore [D] | Del. John Overington [R] |
Del. John Pino [D] | Del. William Stemple [D] | Del. Carrie Webster [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-08 | Chapter 66, Acts, 2008 | |
2008-03-27 | Approved by Governor 3/27/08 | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/27/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/27/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-17 | To Governor 3/17/08 | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/17/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/17/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-08 | House Message received | |
2008-03-07 | Completed legislative action | |
2008-03-07 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-03-07 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 402) | |
2008-03-07 | House received Senate message | |
2008-03-07 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2008-03-07 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 15) | |
2008-03-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-03-07 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-03-07 | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2008-03-07 | Unanimous consent to amend | |
2008-03-07 | Senate reconsidered passage of bill (Voice vote) | |
2008-03-07 | Senate reconsidered action (voice vote) | |
2008-03-07 | Senate requests return of bill from House | |
2008-03-06 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2008-03-06 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 31) | |
2008-03-06 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-03-06 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 30) | |
2008-03-06 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-03-06 | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) | |
2008-03-06 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-03-06 | On 2nd reading | |
2008-03-05 | Reported do pass, with amendments | |
2008-03-05 | Having been read 1st time, prior proceedings, 3/4/08 | |
2008-03-04 | On second reading to Judiciary | |
2008-03-04 | Read 1st time | |
2008-03-04 | On 1st reading | |
2008-03-04 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-03-04 | Unanimous consent | |
2008-03-04 | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2008-02-21 | To Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2008-02-21 | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Judiciary | |
2008-02-21 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-02-20 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-20 | Passed House (Roll No. 79) | |
2008-02-20 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-20 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-19 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-19 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-18 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-18 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-02-15 | By substitute, do pass | |
2008-01-23 | To House Judiciary | |
2008-01-23 | Introduced in House | |
2008-01-23 | To Judiciary | |
2008-01-23 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB572 (Same As) 2008-02-05 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17B | 2 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17B | 2B | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17B | 2B | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17B | 2B | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17B | 2B | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17B | 2B | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17B | 2B | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17B | 2B | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17B | 2B | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17B | 2B | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17B | 2B | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17B | 2B | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |