WV HB4138 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 215, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 215, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require all schools and daycares that use a heating system or other device that emits carbon monoxide to install a carbon monoxide detectors.
Title
Requiring certain public or private schools and daycare centers to install carbon monoxide detectors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 290) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 287) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 39) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 287) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 39) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Chapter 215, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/20/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-20 | House | Approved by Governor 3/20/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/20/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/8/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-08 | House | To Governor 3/8/18 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | To Governor 3/8/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-03 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-02 | House | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-02 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-02 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 290) |
2018-03-02 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 287) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments |
2018-02-05 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-05 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-05 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-02 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-02 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 39) |
2018-02-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-02 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2018-02-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-01 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-31 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-01-31 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-30 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-01-16 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-01-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-16 | House | To Judiciary |
2018-01-16 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 3 | 16a | Amended Code | Citation Text |