WV HB4113 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 228, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 228, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Public Health definitions and powers of secretary and commissioner
Title
Public Health definitions and powers of secretary and commissioner
Sponsors
Del. Matthew Rohrbach [R] | Del. Amy Summers [R] | Del. Dean Jeffries [R] | Del. Heather Tully [R] |
Del. Guy Ward [R] | Del. Mick Bates [D] | Del. Ken Reed [R] | Del. Evan Worrell [R] |
Del. Ruth Rowan [R] | Del. Phil Mallow [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 464) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 463) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 394) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 394) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 43) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 42) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 463) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 394) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 394) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 43) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 42) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 228, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/30/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/25/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/25/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/25/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-10 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-10 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 464) |
2022-03-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 463) |
2022-03-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 394) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 394) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2022-01-26 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2022-01-26 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-01-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-01-25 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 43) |
2022-01-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 42) |
2022-01-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-01-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-01-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-01-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-20 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-01-17 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2022-01-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-17 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2022-01-17 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 1 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 1 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 1 | 13 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
16 | 1 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 1 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 1 | 21 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
16 | 1 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 1 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 1 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 1 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 1 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 1 | 8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
16 | 2 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 2 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 2 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 2 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 2 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 2 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |