WV HB4073 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the State Fire Marshal to promulgate a legislative rule relating to standards for the certification and continuing education of municipal, county, and other public sector building code officials, building code inspectors and plans examiners.This section is new; therefore,
Title
Authorizing the State Fire Marshal to promulgate a legislative rule relating to standards for the certification and continuing education of municipal, county, and other public sector building code officials, building code inspectors and plans examiners
Sponsors
Del. Doug Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | House | To House Judiciary |
2024-01-19 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2024-01-10 | House | To House Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-10 | House | To Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services then Judiciary |
2024-01-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB46 (Similar To) 2024-01-24 - Reported in Com. Sub. for S. B. 36
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 6 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |