WV HB4062 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reducing the cost of prescription drugs
Title
Reducing the cost of prescription drugs
Sponsors
Del. Jeffrey Pack [R] | Del. Jordan Hill [R] | Del. Mick Bates [D] | Del. Barbara Fleischauer [D] |
Del. Cody Thompson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 19) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2020-01-22 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Finance |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-01-21 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 19) |
2020-01-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-01-21 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-20 | House | Postponed on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 1/21/20 |
2020-01-20 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-01-17 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-16 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-01-16 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-15 | House | Do pass |
2020-01-08 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2020-01-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-08 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2020-01-08 | House | Filed for introduction |