WV HB4042 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 243, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 243, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to redefine school zone to facilitate placement of school zone signs.
Title
Redefining school zone to facilitate placement of school zone signs
Sponsors
Del. Steve Westfall [R] | Del. Martin Atkinson [R] | Del. Danny Wagner [R] | Del. Mark Dean [R] |
Del. Cindy Frich [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 487) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 385) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 160) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 385) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 160) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Chapter 243, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-22 | House | Approved by Governor 3/22/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/22/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/22/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/16/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/16/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-16 | House | To Governor 3/16/18 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 487) |
2018-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 385) |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-03-05 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2018-02-21 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-21 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-21 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 160) |
2018-02-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-20 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-19 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-16 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-16 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-15 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-02-07 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-02-07 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2018-01-12 | House | To House Education |
2018-01-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-12 | House | To Education then Judiciary |
2018-01-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17C | 6 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |