WV HB3231 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB3231
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-26 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-26 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Public Utilities not required to pay interest on security deposits
Title
Public Utilities not required to pay interest on security deposits
Sponsors
Del. Roger Conley [R] | Del. Clay Riley [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 281) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-26 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-26 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 281) |
2021-03-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2021-03-16 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-03-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-16 | House | To Judiciary |
2021-03-16 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB3231 (Carry Over) 2021-03-26 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 3 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |