WV HB3108 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Tabled on 3rd reading, Special Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Tabled on 3rd reading, Special Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorizing redirection of certain amounts to the General Revenue Fund.
Title
Relating to authorizing redirection of certain amounts to the General Revenue Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Nelson [R] | Del. Carol Miller [R] | Del. Brent Boggs [D] | Del. Steve Westfall [R] |
Del. William Anderson [R] | Del. Cindy Frich [R] | Del. William Hartman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Tabled on 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed at foot of calendar |
2017-03-29 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-28 | House | Postponed on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/29/17 |
2017-03-28 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2017-03-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-27 | House | Postponed on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/28/17 |
2017-03-27 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2017-03-27 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-23 | House | Do pass |
2017-03-23 | House | Originating in House Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SB362 (Similar To) 2017-05-23 - Chapter 20, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 2C | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22A | 10d | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22A | 10e | Amended Code | Citation Text |