WV HB3024 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to create and implement the West Virginia Business Ready Sites Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

West Virginia Business Ready Sites Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-09 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 704) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 703) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 482) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 482) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 337) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 336) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseVetoed by Governor 3/27/19
2019-03-09HouseVetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateVetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-25HouseTo Governor 3/25/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-09HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-09HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-09HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 704)
2019-03-09HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 703)
2019-03-09HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-09SenateSenate requests House to concur
2019-03-09SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 482)
2019-03-09SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 482)
2019-03-09SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-09SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-03-08SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2019-03-08SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-03-07SenateRead 1st time
2019-03-07SenateOn 1st reading
2019-03-06SenateReported do pass, with amendment
2019-02-27SenateTo Government Organization
2019-02-27SenateTo Government Organization
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-02-27SenateHouse Message received
2019-02-26HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-02-26HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 337)
2019-02-26HousePassed House (Roll No. 336)
2019-02-26HouseRead 3rd time
2019-02-26HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-25HousePostponed on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/26/19
2019-02-25HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-22HouseRead 2nd time
2019-02-22HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-21HouseRead 1st time
2019-02-21HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-20HouseBy substitute, do pass
2019-02-12HouseTo House Government Organization
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-12HouseTo Government Organization
2019-02-12HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB3092 (Similar To) 2019-02-12 - To House Government Organization

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2421nNew CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=3024&year=2019&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb3024%20intr.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=3024
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB3024%20SUB.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=3024
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB3024%20SUB%20ENR.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=3024
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00336.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00337.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/03-09-0482.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00703.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00704.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback