WV HB2992 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Vetoed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to governmental websites
Title
Relating to governmental websites
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 564) (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 402) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 191) (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 402) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 191) (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-21 | House | To Governor 3/21/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/21/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 564) |
2019-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 402) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2019-03-01 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Finance |
2019-02-18 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-02-18 | Senate | To Government Organization then Finance |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-18 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 191) |
2019-02-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-15 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-14 | House | Postponed on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/15/19 |
2019-02-14 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-13 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-12 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-12 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-11 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-11 | House | Originating in House Government Organization |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5F | 1 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 1 | 3rr | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 39 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |