WV HB2931 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to clarify that the State Lottery Commission does not have authority over nonlottery games, and that criminal penalties associated with unauthorized gaming tables or devices apply only to gaming tables or devices which involve consideration, prize and chance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifying that the State Lottery Commission has no authority over nonlottery games

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-09HouseOn 3rd reading, House Calendar
2019-02-28HouseFrom Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar
2019-02-27HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-26HousePostponed on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/27/19
2019-02-26HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-25HouseRead 2nd time
2019-02-25HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-22HouseRead 1st time
2019-02-22HouseImmediate consideration
2019-02-22HouseBy substitute, do pass
2019-02-08HouseTo House Judiciary
2019-02-08HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-08HouseTo Judiciary
2019-02-08HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
29229Amended CodeCitation Text
61101Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback