WV HB2817 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2817
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 59, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 59, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Donated Drug Repository Program
Title
Donated Drug Repository Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 432) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 434) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 361) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 57) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 434) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 361) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 57) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 59, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-28 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/25/22 |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/25/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/25/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 432) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 434) |
2022-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 361) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Motion to reconsider committee amendment adopted (voice vote) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Deferred until foot of 2nd reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-03-03 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2022-02-01 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2022-02-01 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-01-31 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-01-31 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 57) |
2022-01-31 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-01-31 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-01-28 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-27 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-01-27 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-26 | House | Do pass |
2022-01-12 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-12 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2022-01-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2817 (Carry Over) 2021-03-18 - To Health and Human Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60B | 1 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60B | 1 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60B | 1 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60B | 1 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60B | 1 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60B | 1 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60B | 1 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60B | 1 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |