WV HB2772 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 21, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 21, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Expiring funds to the unappropriated surplus balance in the State Fund, General Revenue, from the Auditor's Office - Purchasing Card Administration Fund
Title
Expiring funds to the unappropriated surplus balance in the State Fund, General Revenue, from the Auditor's Office - Purchasing Card Administration Fund
Sponsors
Del. Tim Miley [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-14 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 24) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 24) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 388) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 387) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 24) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 388) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 387) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Chapter 21, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor with reductions 3/20/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-20 | House | Approved by Governor with reductions 3/20/15 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor with reductions 3/20/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-20 | House | To Governor 3/20/15 |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/20/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-14 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 24) |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 24) |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-14 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-13 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Having been read 1st time 3/10/15 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Finance |
2015-03-10 | Senate | To Finance |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-09 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 388) |
2015-03-09 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 387) |
2015-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-09 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-09 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2015-03-09 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-07 | House | Amendments pending |
2015-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-03-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-05 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2015-02-16 | House | To House Finance |
2015-02-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-16 | House | To Finance |
2015-02-16 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB462 (Same As) 2015-02-12 - To Finance