WV HB2742 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing explicit authority to process an online driver’s license or identification renewal or reissuance when the applicant needs to update the address.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing explicit authority to process an online driver’s license or identification renewal or reissuance when the applicant needs to update the address

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 224) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-22SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2021-03-22SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2021-03-22SenateIntroduced in Senate
2021-03-19HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-03-19HousePassed House (Roll No. 224)
2021-03-19HouseRead 3rd time
2021-03-19HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2021-03-18HouseRead 2nd time
2021-03-18HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2021-03-17HouseRead 1st time
2021-03-17HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2021-03-16HouseDo pass
2021-03-05HouseTo House Government Organization
2021-03-05HouseDo pass, but first to Government Organization
2021-02-24HouseTo House Technology and Infrastructure
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced in House
2021-02-24HouseTo Technology and Infrastructure then Government Organization
2021-02-24HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
17B213Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback