WV HB2645 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 216, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 216, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to establish critical need alternative teaching certificates, provide for the requirements to obtain such a certificate and provide criteria for the renewal of such certificates. The bill also expands the availability of the Underwood-Smith Teacher Loan Assistance Program, and increases the annual amount of assistance available from $2,000 to $3,000.
Title
Expanding the availability of the Underwood-Smith Teacher Loan Assistance Program
Sponsors
Del. Tim Armstead [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 14) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 348) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 348) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Chapter 216, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/15 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-16 | Senate | To Governor 3/16/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-16 | House | To Governor 3/16/15 |
2015-03-16 | House | To Governor 3/16/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 14) |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2015-03-05 | Senate | To Education |
2015-03-05 | Senate | To Education |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-03-05 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-04 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-04 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 348) |
2015-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-03 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-03 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-02 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-03-02 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-28 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2015-02-28 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2015-02-06 | House | To House Education |
2015-02-06 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-06 | House | To Education then Finance |
2015-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB408 (Same As) 2015-02-28 - To Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18A | 3 | 1d | New Code | See Bill Text |
18A | 3 | 2a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18C | 4A | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18C | 4A | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18C | 4A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |