WV HB2447 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 29, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 29, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to rename the Court of Claims the state Claims Commission, rename judges commissioners; modify definitions; provide explicit powers for the removal of commissioners; provide authority to the Joint Committee on Government and Finance for the hiring of a clerk, chief deputy clerk, and deputy clerks; and establish a shortened procedure for certain road condition claims. Â
Title
Renaming the Court of Claims the state Claims Commission
Sponsors
Del. Tim Armstead [R] | Del. John Shott [R] | Del. Amy Summers [R] | Del. John Overington [R] |
Del. Geoff Foster [R] | Del. Ray Hollen [R] | Del. Kelli Sobonya [R] | Del. John O'Neal [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-08 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 504) (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 522) (Y: 65 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with title amend, passed (Roll No. 291) (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 162) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 15) (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 522) (Y: 65 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with title amend, passed (Roll No. 291) (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 162) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 15) (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Chapter 29, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/25/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-25 | House | Approved by Governor 4/25/17 |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/25/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/20/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/20/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-20 | House | To Governor 4/20/17 |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 504) |
2017-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-08 | House | House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 522) |
2017-04-08 | House | Conference report received-House |
2017-04-05 | House | Conference report filed - House |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Conference report filed - Senate |
2017-04-05 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-04 | House | To conference |
2017-04-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-04 | House | House appointed conferees: Zatezalo, O'Neal, Miller, R. |
2017-04-04 | House | House agreed to conference |
2017-04-04 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate appoints conference committee: Weld, Maynard, Jeffries |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate requests conference (Voice vote) |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate refused to concur |
2017-04-03 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-01 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with title amend, passed (Roll No. 291) |
2017-04-01 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2017-04-01 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2017-03-31 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 162) |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-21 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-20 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-18 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2017-02-24 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-02-24 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-24 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-02-23 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-02-23 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 15) |
2017-02-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-02-23 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2017-02-22 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-02-22 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2017-02-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-02-21 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2017-02-20 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-02-15 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-15 | House | To Judiciary |
2017-02-15 | House | Filed for introduction |