WV HB2392 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2392
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow the Alcohol Beverage Control Commissioner to issue special one-day licenses for the retail sale of nonintoxicating beer and alcoholic liquors to a duly organized nonprofit corporation, limited liability entity or an association having received federal tax-exempt status, when raising money for artistic, athletic, charitable, educational or religious purposes.
Title
Allowing the Alcohol Beverage Control Commissioner to issue special one-day licenses for charitable events
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 103) (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-11 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 103) |
2019-02-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-05 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-14 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-14 | House | To Government Organization |
2019-01-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2392 (Carry Over) 2019-02-11 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 16 | 11a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 16 | 11b | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 16 | 6b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 6 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |