WV HB2362 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 103, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to provide a mechanism to allow a qualified voter to vote by absentee ballot if: (1) The person is confined to a specific location within the county (other than a hospital or other duly licensed health care facility or a nursing home); and (2) Is prevented from travelling to a polling place and voting in person because of illness, injury or other medical reason, or a physical disability or immobility due to extreme advanced age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ardala Miller Memorial Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 500) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 348) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 12) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No 11) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseChapter 103, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-25HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/19
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal
2019-03-19HouseTo Governor 3/19/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/19/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/19/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-07SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-06HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-06HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-06HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 500)
2019-03-06HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-05SenateSenate requests House to concur
2019-03-05SenateTrump Title amendment adopted
2019-03-05SenateJudiciary Title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
2019-03-05SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 348)
2019-03-05SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-05SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-03-04SenateCommittee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-04SenateAmendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-04SenateReported by clerk
2019-03-02SenateLaid over on 2nd reading 3/2/19, amend pending
2019-03-02SenateCommittee Amendment Reported
2019-03-02SenateRead 2nd time
2019-03-02SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-03-01SenateRead 1st time
2019-03-01SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-28SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2019-01-23SenateTo Judiciary
2019-01-23SenateTo Judiciary
2019-01-23SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-23SenateHouse Message received
2019-01-22HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-01-22HousePassed House (Roll No. 12)
2019-01-22HouseRead 3rd time
2019-01-22HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-21HouseAmendment adopted (Roll No 11)
2019-01-21HouseRead 2nd time
2019-01-21HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-18HouseRead 1st time
2019-01-18HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-01-17HouseBy substitute, do pass
2019-01-14HouseTo House Judiciary
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced in House
2019-01-14HouseTo Judiciary
2019-01-14HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
331Amended CodeCitation Text
335cAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=2362&year=2019&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb2362%20intr.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=2362
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2362%20SUB.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=2362
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2362%20SUB%20ENG.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=2362
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2362%20SUB%20ENR.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=2362
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00011.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00012.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/03-05-0348.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00500.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback