WV HB2335 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2335
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing the minimum criminal penalty for a driver who, in an impaired state, causes the death of a minor
Title
Increasing the minimum criminal penalty for a driver who, in an impaired state, causes the death of a minor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 96) (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-09 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 96) |
2021-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-05 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-04 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-04 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-03 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2021-02-12 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-12 | House | To Judiciary |
2021-02-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2335 (Carry Over) 2021-03-09 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17C | 5 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |