WV HB2260 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 54, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 54, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify the department’s obligations to enter into performance-based contracts with child-placing agencies.Â
Title
Relating to procurement of child placing services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 389) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 284) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 258) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 50) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 284) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 258) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 50) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Chapter 54, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/9/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | Approved by Governor 4/9/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/9/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-05 | House | To Governor 4/5/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-05 | House | To Governor 4/5/21 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | To Governor 4/5/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-01 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-03-31 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-03-31 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-31 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 389) |
2021-03-31 | House | House concurred in Senate effective date (Voice) |
2021-03-31 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur in changed effective date |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 284) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate reconsidered effective date |
2021-03-31 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-03-31 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-31 | House | House acceded to request for return of measure (Voice vote) |
2021-03-31 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate requests return of bill from House |
2021-03-31 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 258) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 3/29/21 |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 3/27/21 |
2021-03-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2021-02-24 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2021-02-24 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-23 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-02-23 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 50) |
2021-02-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-02-23 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-02-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-02-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-02-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-02-18 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2021-02-12 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-02-12 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2021-02-10 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-10 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | 2 | 111a | Amended Code | Citation Text |