WV HB2123 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2123
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-01 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-01 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to make the West Virginia Schools for the Deaf and Blind eligible to participate in any and all funding administered or distributed by the West Virginia School Building Authority.
Title
Making the West Virginia Schools for the Deaf and Blind eligible to participate in any and all funding administered or distributed by the West Virginia School Building Authority
Sponsors
Del. Ruth Rowan [R] | Del. Tim Armstead [R] | Del. Daryl Cowles [R] | Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] |
Del. Paul Espinosa [R] | Del. John O'Neal [R] | Del. William Anderson [R] | Sen. Eric Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 27) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 26) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 26) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | Senate | To Education |
2017-03-01 | Senate | To Education then Finance |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-01 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-02-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-02-28 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 27) |
2017-02-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 26) |
2017-02-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-02-28 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2017-02-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-02-27 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2017-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2017-02-23 | House | Do pass |
2017-02-16 | House | To House Finance |
2017-02-16 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2017-02-08 | House | To House Education |
2017-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-08 | House | To Education then Finance |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2123 (Carry Over) 2017-03-01 - To Education
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 9D | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9D | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9D | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 9D | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9D | 4c | Amended Code | Citation Text |