WV HB2122 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-20 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-20 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to make it illegal for anyone to photograph a corpse except for certain legitimate purposes. This section is new; therefore, it has been completely underscored.
Title
Making it illegal for anyone to photograph a corpse except for certain legitimate purposes
Sponsors
Del. George Ambler [R] | Del. Roy Cooper [R] | Del. Gary Howell [R] | Del. Eric Householder [R] |
Del. Ron Walters [R] | Sen. Randy Smith [R] | Del. Denny Canterbury [R] | Del. Marty Gearheart [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-01-28 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 17) (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 2) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 5) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 2) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 5) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-20 | House | To House Judiciary |
2015-01-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-01-20 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2015-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1 (Same As) 2015-01-22 - To House Energy
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2F | 1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
24 | 2F | 10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
24 | 2F | 11 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
24 | 2F | 12 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
24 | 2F | 2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
24 | 2F | 3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
24 | 2F | 4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
24 | 2F | 5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
24 | 2F | 6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
24 | 2F | 7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
24 | 2F | 9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
61 | 12 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |