WV HB210 | 2010 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-20 - Tabled on 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-20 - Tabled on 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide uniformity in alternative schools and to require a pilot program that will allow alternative schools in elementary and middle schools.
Title
Providing uniformity in alternative schools and requiring a pilot program that will allow alternative schools in elementary and middle schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-20 | Tabled on 3rd reading, House Calendar | |
2010-07-20 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-07-19 | On 2nd reading, House Calendar | |
2010-07-19 | Read 1st time | |
2010-07-19 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-07-19 | Do pass | |
2010-07-18 | To House Finance | |
2010-07-18 | Do pass, but first to Finance | |
2010-07-17 | To House Education | |
2010-07-17 | Introduced in House | |
2010-07-17 | To Education then Finance | |
2010-07-17 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2010 (Same As) 2010-07-30 - Chapter 6, Acts, 2nd Extraordinary Session, 2010