WV SB2010 | 2010 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-30 - Chapter 6, Acts, 2nd Extraordinary Session, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to provide uniformity in alternative schools and to require a pilot program that will allow alternative schools in elementary and middle schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to pilot programs for alternative schools in elementary and middle schools

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-07-21 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 514) (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 513) (Y: 83 N: 1 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-30 Chapter 6, Acts, 2nd Extraordinary Session, 2010
2010-07-21 Approved by Governor 7/26/10 - House Journal
2010-07-21 Approved by Governor 7/26/10 - Senate Journal
2010-07-26 Approved by Governor 7/26/10
2010-07-26 To Governor 7/26/10
2010-07-21 To Governor 7/26/10 - Senate Journal
2010-07-26 To Governor 7/26/10
2010-07-21 To Governor 7/26/10 - House Journal
2010-07-21 House received Senate message
2010-07-21 Completed legislative action
2010-07-21 Communicated to House
2010-07-21 Effective from passage (Roll No. 6)
2010-07-21 Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 6)
2010-07-21 House Message received
2010-07-21 Communicated to Senate
2010-07-21 Effective from passage (Roll No. 514)
2010-07-21 Passed House (Roll No. 513)
2010-07-21 Read 3rd time
2010-07-21 On 3rd reading, House Calendar
2010-07-20 Amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2010-07-20 Read 2nd time
2010-07-20 On 2nd reading, House Calendar
2010-07-19 Read 1st time
2010-07-19 Immediate consideration
2010-07-19 Reference dispensed
2010-07-19 Introduced in House
2010-07-18 Ordered to House
2010-07-18 Effective from passage (Roll No. 6)
2010-07-18 Passed Senate (Roll No. 6)
2010-07-18 Read 3rd time
2010-07-18 On 3rd reading
2010-07-18 Read 2nd time
2010-07-18 Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 5)
2010-07-18 On 2nd reading
2010-07-18 Read 1st time
2010-07-18 On 1st reading
2010-07-18 Immediate consideration
2010-07-18 2nd reference dispensed
2010-07-18 Reported do pass, but first to Finance
2010-07-17 To Education
2010-07-17 Introduced in Senate
2010-07-17 To Education then Finance
2010-07-17 Filed for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1826Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback