WV HB2086 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2086

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 128, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Uniform Real Property Electronic Recording Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uniform Real Property Electronic Recording Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment, repassed bill (Roll No. 350) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House amd. & repassed to meet the obj. of the Governor (Roll No. 376) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 212) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 100) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 24) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-15HouseChapter 128, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
2020-03-25HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20
2020-03-07HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-12HouseTo Governor 3/12/20
2020-03-07HouseTo Governor 3/12/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateTo Governor 3/12/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-06HouseHouse received Senate message
2020-02-28SenateCompleted legislative action
2020-02-28SenateCommunicated to House
2020-02-28SenateSenate concurred in House amendment, repassed bill (Roll No. 350)
2020-02-28SenateHouse Message received
2020-02-28SenateVetoed by Governor 2/24/20 - Senate Journal
2020-02-27HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-02-27HouseHouse amd. & repassed to meet the obj. of the Governor (Roll No. 376)
2020-02-27HouseReported by the Clerk
2020-02-27HouseHouse reconsidered its action
2020-02-27HouseVetoed by Governor 2/24/20 - House Journal
2020-02-24HouseVetoed by Governor 2/24/20
2020-02-24HouseTo Governor 2/24/20
2020-02-25HouseTo Governor 2/24/20 - House Journal
2020-02-24SenateTo Governor 2/24/20 - Senate Journal
2020-02-19SenateHouse Message received
2020-02-18HouseCompleted legislative action
2020-02-18HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-02-18HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 212)
2020-02-18HouseHouse received Senate message
2020-02-10SenateSenate requests House to concur
2020-02-10SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 100)
2020-02-10SenateRead 3rd time
2020-02-10SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-02-07SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-02-07SenateRead 2nd time
2020-02-07SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-02-06SenateRead 1st time
2020-02-06SenateOn 1st reading
2020-02-05SenateReported do pass, with amendment
2020-01-23SenateTo Judiciary
2020-01-23SenateTo Judiciary
2020-01-23SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-01-22HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-01-22HousePassed House (Roll No. 24)
2020-01-22HouseRead 3rd time
2020-01-22HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-01-21HouseRead 2nd time
2020-01-21HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-01-20HouseRead 1st time
2020-01-20HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-01-17HouseBy substitute, do pass
2020-01-08HouseTo House Judiciary
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-08HouseTo Judiciary
2020-01-08HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2086 (Carry Over) 2019-01-09 - To House Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
39A41New CodeSee Bill Text
39A42New CodeSee Bill Text
39A43New CodeSee Bill Text
39A44New CodeSee Bill Text
39A45New CodeSee Bill Text
39A46New CodeSee Bill Text
39A47New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=2086&year=2020&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb2086%20intr.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=2086
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2086%20SUB.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=2086
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2086%20SUB%20ENR.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=2086
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2086%20SUB%20ENR2.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=2086
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00024.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/senate/02-10-0100.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00212.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00376.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/senate/02-28-0350.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback