WV HB204 | 2010 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-20 - Tabled on 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to create a compulsory comprehensive health screening for students entering public school for the first time in this state and students entering third grade, sixth grade and ninth grade .

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating a compulsory comprehensive health screening for public school students

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-20 Tabled on 3rd reading, House Calendar
2010-07-20 Read 2nd time
2010-07-19 On 2nd reading, House Calendar
2010-07-19 Read 1st time
2010-07-19 Immediate consideration
2010-07-19 2nd reference dispensed
2010-07-19 By substitute, do pass
2010-07-17 To House Education
2010-07-17 Introduced in House
2010-07-17 To Education then Finance
2010-07-17 Filed for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2004 (Same As) 2010-07-21 - Communicated to Senate

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18517Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback