WV SB2004 | 2010 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-21 - Communicated to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to create a compulsory comprehensive health screening for students entering public school for the first time in this state and students entering third grade, sixth grade and ninth grade .

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to compulsory comprehensive health screens for students

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-07-21 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 506) (Y: 81 N: 4 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 505) (Y: 75 N: 10 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-21 Communicated to Senate
2010-07-21 House insisted on position (Voice vote)
2010-07-21 House received Senate message
2010-07-21 Communicated to House
2010-07-21 Senate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote)
2010-07-21 House Message received
2010-07-21 Communicated to Senate
2010-07-21 Effective from passage (Roll No. 506)
2010-07-21 Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2010-07-21 Passed House (Roll No. 505)
2010-07-21 Read 3rd time
2010-07-21 On 3rd reading, House Calendar
2010-07-20 Amended to include the provisions of Com. Sub. for H. B. 204
2010-07-20 Read 2nd time
2010-07-20 On 2nd reading, House Calendar
2010-07-19 Read 1st time
2010-07-19 Immediate consideration
2010-07-19 Reference dispensed
2010-07-19 Introduced in House
2010-07-18 Ordered to House
2010-07-18 Effective from passage (Roll No. 2)
2010-07-18 Passed Senate (Roll No. 2)
2010-07-18 Read 3rd time
2010-07-18 On 3rd reading
2010-07-18 Read 2nd time
2010-07-18 Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 1)
2010-07-18 2nd reference dispensed
2010-07-18 On 2nd reading
2010-07-18 Read 1st time
2010-07-18 On 1st reading
2010-07-18 Immediate consideration
2010-07-18 Reported do pass, but first to Finance
2010-07-17 To Education
2010-07-17 Introduced in Senate
2010-07-17 To Education then Finance
2010-07-17 Filed for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18517Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback