WV HB2019 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 144, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 144, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Elevating Economic Development and Tourism Departments
Title
Elevating Economic Development and Tourism Departments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 41) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 23) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 23) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Chapter 144, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-03-08 | House | Approved by Governor 3/8/21 |
2021-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/8/21 - House Journal |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/8/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-03-03 | Senate | To Governor 3/2/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-03-03 | House | To Governor 3/2/21 - House Journal |
2021-03-02 | House | To Governor 3/2/21 |
2021-03-01 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 41) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-02-24 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2021-02-18 | Senate | To Finance |
2021-02-18 | Senate | To Finance |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-17 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-02-17 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 23) |
2021-02-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-02-17 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-02-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-02-16 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-02-15 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-02-15 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-02-13 | House | Do pass |
2021-02-12 | House | To House Government Organization |
2021-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-12 | House | To Government Organization |
2021-02-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB274 (Similar To) 2021-02-13 - To Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5B | 1 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2 | 3b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2 | 4a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2 | 6a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2 | 9a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2I | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2I | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2I | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2I | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2I | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2I | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2I | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5F | 1 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5F | 2 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |