WV HB201 | 2017 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-25 - Chapter 4, Acts, 2nd Extraordinary Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is the exempt from personal income tax military retirement income, including retirement income from the regular Armed Forces, reserves and National Guard paid by the United States or by this state after December 31, 2017, including any survivorship annuities, to the extent included in gross income for federal income tax purposes for the taxable year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempting military retirement income from personal income tax

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-17 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 9) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 9) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 8) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 689) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 688) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 687) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - Ruling sustained (Roll No. 686) (Y: 63 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-25HouseChapter 4, Acts, 2nd Extraordinary Session, 2017
2017-10-24HouseApproved by Governor 10/24/17
2017-11-13SenateApproved by Governor 10/24/17 - Senate Journal
2017-10-20HouseTo Governor 10/20/17
2017-11-13SenateTo Governor 10/20/17 - Senate Journal
2017-10-17HouseHouse received Senate message
2017-10-17SenateCompleted legislative action
2017-10-17SenateCommunicated to House
2017-10-17SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 9)
2017-10-17SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 9)
2017-10-17SenateRead 3rd time
2017-10-17SenateRead 2nd time
2017-10-17SenateConstitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 8)
2017-10-17SenateRead 1st time
2017-10-17SenateCommittee reference dispensed
2017-10-17SenateImmediate consideration
2017-10-17SenateIntroduced in Senate
2017-10-17SenateHouse Message received
2017-10-17HouseCommunicated to Senate
2017-10-17HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 689)
2017-10-17HousePassed House (Roll No. 688)
2017-10-17HouseRead 3rd time
2017-10-17HouseDispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 687)
2017-10-17HouseRuling sustained (Roll No. 686)
2017-10-17HouseAmendment ruled not germane
2017-10-17HouseAmendment reported by the Clerk
2017-10-17HouseAmendment ruled not germane
2017-10-17HouseAmendment reported by the Clerk
2017-10-17HouseRead 2nd time
2017-10-17HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2017-10-16HouseRead 1st time
2017-10-16HouseImmediate consideration
2017-10-16HouseReference dispensed
2017-10-16HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2001 (Similar To) 2017-10-16 - To Finance

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
112112Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=201&year=2017&sessiontype=2X&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb201%20intr.htm&yr=2017&sesstype=2X&i=201
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb201%20ENR.htm&yr=2017&sesstype=2X&i=201
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2017/2X/votes/house/00686.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2017/2X/votes/house/00687.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2017/2X/votes/house/00688.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2017/2X/votes/house/00689.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2017/2X/votes/senate/10-17-0008.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2017/2X/votes/senate/10-17-0009.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback